VA HB1525 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Background checks; peer recovery specialists; barrier crime exceptions. Permits the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, direct care service providers, and community boards to hire peer recovery specialists who have been convicted of certain barrier crimes where a history of such offense does not pose a risk in the work of a peer recovery specialist.
Title
Peer recovery specialists; barrier crime exceptions.
Sponsors
Del. Carrie Coyner [R] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Sally Hudson [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Kim Taylor [R] |
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138) | |
2023-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 138 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1525ER) |
2023-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1525H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105167D-H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105167D-H1 |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101949D |
Same As/Similar To
SB846 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139)
SB846 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139)
SB846 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |