VA HB1525 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use of handheld personal communications devices; highway work zones. Imposes a mandatory fine of $250 for using a handheld personal communications device for reading emails or texting while operating a motor vehicle in a highway work zone, defined in the bill, when workers are present.
Title
Handheld personal communications devices; prohibits use in highway work zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 606 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1525ER) |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-09 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1525H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106659D-H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106659D-H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18105143D |