VA HB1524 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0649)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0649)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Opioid Use Reduction and Jail-Based Substance Use Disorder Treatment and Transition Fund; established. Establishes the Virginia Opioid Use Reduction and Jail-Based Substance Use Disorder Treatment and Transition Fund to be administered by the Department of Criminal Justice Services for the purpose of funding and supporting the planning and implementation of locally administered jail-based addiction recovery and substance use disorder treatment and transition programs in local and regional jails. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2024.
Title
Va. Opioid Use Reduction & Jail-Based Substance Use Disorder Treatment & Transition Fund; created.
Sponsors
Del. Carrie Coyner [R] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] |
Del. Kim Taylor [R] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N) (Y: 0 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N) (Y: 0 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0649) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 649 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1524ER) |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Deeds, Lucas, McDougle |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2023-02-23 | House | Delegates: Coyner, Ballard, McQuinn |
2023-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2023-02-23 | House | House acceded to request |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 23107183D-S1 (0-Y 94-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1524S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23107183D-S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23107183D-S1 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1524H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105968D-H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105968D-H1 |
2023-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101601D |
Same As/Similar To
SB820 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
SB820 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
SB820 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)