VA HB1523 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Appointment of substitute judges; district courts. Requires substitute judges for the general district and juvenile and domestic relations district courts to be appointed by the chief judges of those courts instead of the chief judge of the circuit court.
Title
Substitute judges; appointment to district courts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101093D |
Subjects
Appointments
Courts Not of Record
District Courts
Judges Justices and Other Elective Officers
Juvenile and Domestic Relations District Courts
Courts Not of Record
District Courts
Judges Justices and Other Elective Officers
Juvenile and Domestic Relations District Courts
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1523 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1523+hil |