VA HB1522 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Death penalty; severe mental illness. Provides that a defendant in a capital case who had a severe mental illness, which is defined in the bill, at the time of the offense is not eligible for the death penalty. The bill establishes procedures for determining whether a defendant had a severe mental illness at the time of the offense and provides for the appointment of expert evaluators. When the defendant's severe mental illness is at issue, a determination will be made by the jury, or by the judge in a bench trial, as part of the sentencing proceeding, and the defendant bears the burden of proving his severe mental illness by a preponderance of the evidence.
Title
Death penalty; severe mental illness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-27 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101626D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 264.3:1.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 264.3:1.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 264.3:1.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 264.3:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 264.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1522 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1522+hil |