VA HB152 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Land preservation tax credit. Increases from $1 million to $1.5 million the threshold credit amount that triggers verification by the Department of Conservation and Recreation of the conservation value of a land donation. The bill exempts certain state agencies from the verification requirement unless the value of the credit claimed is greater than $2 million. Land preservation tax credit. Increases from $1 million to $1.5 million the threshold credit amount that triggers verification by the Department of Conservation and Recreation of the conservation value of a land donation. The bill exempts certain state agencies from the verification requirement unless the value of the credit claimed is greater than $2 million.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land preservation tax credit; increases threshold credit amount.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-13HouseLeft in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2024-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2024-01-15HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2024-01-02HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2024-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100918D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581512(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback