VA HB1518 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0661)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Research and development expenses tax credits. Creates a step-rate reimbursement structure for the major research and development expenses tax credit in an amount equal to (i) 10 percent, up to the first $1 million, of the difference between (a) Virginia qualified research and development expenses paid or incurred by the taxpayer during the taxable year and (b) 50 percent of the average Virginia qualified research and development expenses paid or incurred by the taxpayer for the three taxable years immediately preceding the taxable year for which the credit is being determined and (ii) five percent of such difference in excess of $1 million. Beginning in taxable year 2023, the bill also (a) imposes an annual per taxpayer major research and development expenses tax credit cap of $300,000, except that such cap increases to $400,000 if the Virginia qualified research was conducted in conjunction with a public or private institution of higher education in the Commonwealth, (b) reduces from $24 million to $16 million the aggregate cap on the major research and development expenses tax credit granted for each fiscal year, and (c) increases from $7.77 million to $15.77 million the aggregate cap on the research and development expenses tax credit granted for each fiscal year beginning in taxable year 2023. Research and development expenses tax credits. Creates a step-rate reimbursement structure for the major research and development expenses tax credit in an amount equal to (i) 10 percent, up to the first $1 million, of the difference between (a) Virginia qualified research and development expenses paid or incurred by the taxpayer during the taxable year and (b) 50 percent of the average Virginia qualified research and development expenses paid or incurred by the taxpayer for the three taxable years immediately preceding the taxable year for which the credit is being determined and (ii) five percent of such difference in excess of $1 million. Beginning in taxable year 2023, the bill also (a) imposes an annual per taxpayer major research and development expenses tax credit cap of $300,000, except that such cap increases to $400,000 if the Virginia qualified research was conducted in conjunction with a public or private institution of higher education in the Commonwealth, (b) reduces from $24 million to $16 million the aggregate cap on the major research and development expenses tax credit granted for each fiscal year, and (c) increases from $7.77 million to $15.77 million the aggregate cap on the research and development expenses tax credit granted for each fiscal year beginning in taxable year 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Research and development expenses; tax credits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0661)
2024-04-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 661 (effective 7/1/24)
2024-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024
2024-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024
2024-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1518ER)
2024-03-05HouseEnrolled
2024-02-28SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2024-02-28SenateRead third time
2024-02-27SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2024-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2024-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2024-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2024-02-13HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2024-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2024-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 24105827D-E
2024-02-12HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1518E
2024-02-12HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2024-02-12HouseRead second time
2024-02-09HouseRead first time
2024-02-07HouseReported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N)
2024-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2024-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2024-02-02HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2024-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2024-01-19HousePresented and ordered printed 24105827D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581439.12:08(n/a)See Bill Text
581439.12:11(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB1518
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1518+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1518E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1518ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+CHAP0661+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/24107095A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+amd+HB1518AH
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB1518F161+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB1518FE161+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB1518FER161+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H1001V0015+HB1518
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H1001V0030+HB1518
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H10V0033+HB1518
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H10V0063+HB1518
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+HV0794+HB1518
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0698HB1518+HB1518
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S05V0421+HB1518
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0727HB1518+HB1518

Bill Comments

feedback