VA HB1518 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Indoor Clean Air Act; hookah lounges. Exempts hookah lounges, as defined in the bill, from the prohibition against smoking in restaurants.
Title
Virginia Indoor Clean Air Act; hookah lounges.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18105147D |