VA HB1514 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health care practitioners; reporting disabilities of drivers. Provides that any doctor of medicine, osteopathy, chiropractic, or podiatry or any nurse practitioner, physician assistant, optometrist, physical therapist, or clinical psychologist who reports to the Department of Motor Vehicles the existence, or probable existence, of a mental or physical disability or infirmity of any person licensed to operate a motor vehicle that the reporting individual believes affects such person's ability to operate a motor vehicle safely is not subject to civil liability or deemed to have violated the practitioner-patient privilege unless he has acted in bad faith or with malicious intent. This bill is identical to SB 1024.
Title
Doctor of medicine, etc.; reporting disabilities of drivers to DMV, not subject to civil liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 712 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1514ER) |
2017-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1514H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104297D-H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104297D-H1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103034D |