VA HB1512 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; academic credit for American Sign Language courses. Requires each public institution of higher education to develop policies for counting credit received for successful completion of foreign language courses, including American Sign Language courses, either in a secondary school or another institution of higher education toward satisfaction of the foreign language entrance, placement, and course credit requirements of the public institution of higher education. The bill requires each public institution of higher education to count credit received for successful completion of American Sign Language courses at the institution toward satisfaction of its foreign language course credit requirements.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; academic credit for American Sign Language courses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292) | |
2017-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 292 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1512ER) |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1512H1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104315D-H1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104315D-H1 |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-12-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102772D |