VA HB1511 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Midwifery; administration of medication. Allows licensed midwives to obtain, possess, and administer drugs and devices within the scope of their practice. The bill requires the Board of Medicine to develop and publish best practice and standards of care guidance for all such drugs. The bill limits the liability of entities that provide or dispense drugs or devices to a licensed midwife and that rely in good faith upon the license information provided by the licensed midwife. Under the bill, completing all Alliance for Innovation on Maternal Health patient safety bundles advanced by the Virginia Neonatal Perinatal Collaborative is required of any licensed midwife who obtains, possesses, and administers drugs and devices within the scope of his practice.
Title
Midwifery; administration of medication.
Sponsors
Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Michelle Maldonado [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 673 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1511ER) |
2023-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-15 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 23106519D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1511S1 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23106519D-S1 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106519D-S1 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 23100353D-E |
2023-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1511E |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-27 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100353D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1275 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674)
SB1275 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674)
SB1275 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2957.9:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |