VA HB1511 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Towing fees. The bill raises from $25 to $30 the additional fee that can be charged for towing a vehicle at night, on weekends, or on a holiday. The bill requires localities in Planning District 8 and Planning District 16 to set such additional fee at between $25 and $30. Current law requires such localities to set such additional fee at $25.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Towing fees; raises to $30 additional fee that can be charged for towing a vehicle at night, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 15-N) (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031)
2020-03-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 31 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020
2020-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020
2020-02-21SenateSigned by President
2020-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1511ER)
2020-02-20HouseEnrolled
2020-02-18SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 15-N)
2020-02-18SenateRead third time
2020-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13SenateReported from Transportation (13-Y 2-N)
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-06HouseVOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N)
2020-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House (50-Y 48-N)
2020-02-05HousePassed by for the day
2020-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-03HouseRead first time
2020-01-30HouseReported from Transportation (12-Y 10-N)
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-08HousePresented and ordered printed 20104626D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621233(n/a)See Bill Text
4621233.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback