VA HB1511 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Presentence reports. Provides that a court shall not order a presentence report in any case in which a defendant is convicted of certain firearms-related crimes that require the imposition of a mandatory minimum sentence, provided that the defendant is convicted of no other crime in the same case.
Title
Presentence reports.
Sponsors
Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Del. Daun Hester [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-12-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103084D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1511 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1511+hil |