VA HB1511 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Disclosure of industrial waste and sewage sludge on land. Requires the owner of land upon which industrial waste or sewage sludge has been stored or to which industrial waste or sewage sludge has been applied pursuant to a permit issued by the Department of Environmental Quality (DEQ) to disclose such storage or application to a prospective purchaser or lessee of the land. If the owner of the subject land fails to make the disclosure in writing, on a form developed by the Real Estate Board in consultation with DEQ, prior to acceptance of a contract for the sale or lease of the subject land, the prospective purchaser or lessee may institute an action to recover actual damages. The disclosure and remedy provisions of the bill are similar to those in the Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act.
Title
Industrial waste and sewage sludge; disclosure of land.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-19 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake |
2015-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100662D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1511 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1511+hil |