VA HB1510 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local incentives for urban green space. Authorizes localities to establish programs to provide regulatory flexibility to encourage the preservation, restoration, or development of urban green space, defined in the bill. The regulatory flexibility may include (i) a reduction in permit fees or (ii) a streamlined process for the approval of permits. Local incentives for urban green space. Authorizes localities to establish programs to provide regulatory flexibility to encourage the preservation, restoration, or development of urban green space, defined in the bill. The regulatory flexibility may include (i) a reduction in permit fees or (ii) a streamlined process for the approval of permits.
Title
Urban green space; local incentives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 427 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1510ER) |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (72-Y 27-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1510H1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105016D-H1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105016D-H1 |
2023-01-25 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103048D |