VA HB1509 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Restrictions on the sale of nicotine vapor products containing liquid nicotine and hemp products intended for smoking; civil penalties. Provides restrictions and prohibitions on certain retail sales that include (i) restrictions on the number of nicotine vapor products containing liquid nicotine, liquid nicotine containers, and hemp products intended for smoking, as such terms are defined in the bill, that may be sold in one transaction to a consumer; (ii) packaging, labeling, and signage requirements for those selling any nicotine vapor products containing liquid nicotine or hemp products intended for smoking; (iii) advertising and marketing requirements for those selling any nicotine vapor products containing liquid nicotine or hemp products intended for smoking; (iv) education requirements for employees at retail establishments selling nicotine vapor products containing liquid nicotine or hemp products intended for smoking; and (v) online delivery sale requirements of nicotine vapor products containing liquid nicotine or hemp products intended for smoking. The Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority and the Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, as applicable, shall enforce such requirements and restrictions and shall impose civil penalties on violations thereof.
Title
Nicotine vapor products; restrictions on sale of products containing liquid nicotine/hemp products.
Sponsors
Del. Holly Seibold [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Marty Martinez [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106980D-H1 |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105629D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 371.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 293.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 293.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 293.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |