VA HB1506 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Pharmacists; prescribing, dispensing, and administration of controlled substances. Allows a pharmacist to initiate treatment with and dispense and administer certain drugs and devices to persons 18 years of age or older in accordance with a statewide protocol developed by the Board of Pharmacy in collaboration with the Board of Medicine and the Department of Health. The bill directs the Board of Pharmacy to establish such protocols by November 1, 2020, to promulgate emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill, and to convene a work group to provide recommendations regarding the development of protocols for the initiating of treatment with and dispensing and administering of additional drugs and devices for persons 18 years of age and older. The bill also clarifies that an accident and sickness insurance policy that provides reimbursement for a service that may be legally performed by a licensed pharmacist shall provide reimbursement for the initiating of treatment with and dispensing and administration of controlled substances by a pharmacist when such initiating of treatment with or dispensing or administration is in accordance with regulations of the Board of Pharmacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacists; initiating of treatment with and dispensing and administering of controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1506ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-08SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N)
2020-03-07HouseVOTE: Adoption (96-Y 2-N)
2020-03-07HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
2020-03-07HouseConference substitute printed 20109812D-H2
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenators: Dunnavant, Barker, Newman, Lewis
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-05HouseDelegates: Sickles, Willett, Hodges
2020-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-05HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-03-04SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-03-04SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
2020-03-03HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 20109069D-S1 (0-Y 98-N)
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-02SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1506S1
2020-03-02SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20109069D-S1
2020-03-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-03-02SenateRead third time
2020-02-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 20109069D-S1
2020-02-27SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (94-Y 2-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (94-Y 2-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1506H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107565D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-06HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107565D-H1
2020-02-06HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-08HousePresented and ordered printed 20105023D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823408(n/a)See Bill Text
5413300(n/a)See Bill Text
5413301(n/a)See Bill Text
5413303.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1506&201+sum+HB1506
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1506+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1506H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1506S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1506H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1506ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0295+HB1506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0787+HB1506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0352+HB1506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1300HB1506+HB1506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1372HB1506+HB1506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1739+HB1506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1492HB1506+HB1506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2039+HB1506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1874HB1506+HB1506

Bill Comments

feedback