VA HB1506 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Vacant developed property; overgrown shrubs and trees. Authorizes localities to require owners of vacant developed property to cut overgrown shrubs and trees on the property. The bill also authorizes localities, after reasonable notice, to cut overgrown shrubs and trees on vacant developed property and charge the cost to the owner.
Title
Vacant developed property; overgrown shrubs and trees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-12-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-12-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101688D |