VA HB1504 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Virtual Virginia; enrollment. Requires enrollment in the Virtual Virginia online learning program during the school year to be open, on a space-available basis, to each public high school student in the Commonwealth and each high school student in the Commonwealth who receives home instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virtual Virginia; enrollment in online learning program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (45-Y 46-N) (Y: 45 N: 46 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED #2 (46-Y 46-N) (Y: 46 N: 46 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (45-Y 51-N) (Y: 45 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Education (11-Y 11-N) (Y: 11 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseFailed to pass
2018-03-10HouseNo further action taken
2018-03-10HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (45-Y 46-N)
2018-03-10HouseConference report rejected by House (45-Y 46-N)
2018-03-10 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-03-10SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (25-Y 15-N)
2018-03-08SenateSenators: Peake, Newman, Howell
2018-03-08SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-08HouseDelegates: Cline, Landes, Keam
2018-03-08HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-08HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-07SenateSenate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: REJECTED #2 (46-Y 46-N)
2018-03-06HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (46-Y 46-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed by temporarily
2018-03-06HouseReconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: REJECTED (45-Y 51-N)
2018-03-06HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (45-Y 51-N)
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N)
2018-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-03-05SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-03-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateReported from Finance (11-Y 5-N)
2018-02-22SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-22SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 49-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (51-Y 49-N)
2018-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 18105109D-E
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1504E
2018-02-12HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 9-N)
2018-02-09HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N)
2018-02-02HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-31HouseReported from Education (12-Y 10-N)
2018-01-31HouseReconsidered by Education
2018-01-29HouseFailed to report (defeated) in Education (11-Y 11-N)
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
2018-01-23HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 18105109D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221212.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1504
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1504+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1504E+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0902V0010+HB1504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0024+HB1504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0043+HB1504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0203V0062+HB1504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0015+HB1504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0757+HB1504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0284+HB1504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0362+HB1504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0829HB1504+HB1504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0908HB1504+HB1504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1382+HB1504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1405+HB1504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1017HB1504+HB1504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1198HB1504+HB1504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1558+HB1504

Bill Comments

feedback