VA HB15 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Public school buses; seat belts. Requires the Board of Education to make regulations to require each new public school bus purchased for the transportation of students to be equipped with a seat belt consisting of a lap belt and shoulder strap or harness in every seat. The bill requires each school board to ensure that no later than July 1, 2038, each school bus that it uses for the transportation of students is equipped with a seat belt in every seat.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public school buses; seat belts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Appropriations
2020-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-31HouseMotion to refer to committee agreed to
2020-01-31HouseMotion to reconsider pass by for the day agreed to
2020-01-31HousePassed by for the day
2020-01-31HouseEngrossment reconsidered by House
2020-01-30HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-29HouseRead first time
2020-01-27HouseReported from Education (17-Y 4-N)
2020-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2019-11-19HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-11-19HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100627D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221177(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback