VA HB1499 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Gun Violence Intervention and Prevention Fund. Establishes the Virginia Gun Violence Intervention and Prevention Fund to be administered by the Department of Criminal Justice Services for the purpose of supporting gun violence intervention and prevention programs, including street outreach, hospital-based violence intervention, and group violence intervention programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Gun Violence Intervention and Prevention Fund; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (23-Y 73-N) (Y: 22 N: 73 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 31-N) (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1499ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (64-Y 34-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (64-Y 34-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-03SenateSenators: Favola, Boysko, McDougle
2020-03-03SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-02HouseDelegates: Bourne, Price, Leftwich
2020-03-02HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-02HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-02-28SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-02-28SenateSenate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: REJECTED (23-Y 73-N)
2020-02-26HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 20108757D-S1 (23-Y 73-N)
2020-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-24SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N)
2020-02-24SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1499S1
2020-02-24SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108757D-S1
2020-02-24SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-24SenateRead third time
2020-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108757D-S1
2020-02-19SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (68-Y 31-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (68-Y 31-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Public Safety (19-Y 3-N)
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseAssigned PS sub: Firearms
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-01-08HousePresented and ordered printed 20104800D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91116.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1499&201+sum+HB1499
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1499+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1499S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1499ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1501V0019+HB1499
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H15V0041+HB1499
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0808+HB1499
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0410+HB1499
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0846HB1499+HB1499
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0921HB1499+HB1499
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1423+HB1499
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1223HB1499+HB1499
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1969+HB1499
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1730HB1499+HB1499

Bill Comments

feedback