VA HB1498 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0275)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Pharmaceutical Manufacturing Grant Program; creation. Creates the Pharmaceutical Manufacturing Grant Program to make grant payments to an eligible pharmaceutical manufacturer that makes a capital investment of at least $1 billion at a facility in Rockingham County and creates at least 152 new full-time jobs at the facility. The pharmaceutical manufacturer would be eligible for an aggregate of $7.5 million in grants paid out over a three-year period if it meets such performance parameters. The bill also makes available, subject to appropriation, $2.525 million to a comprehensive community college and baccalaureate public institution of higher education in or near Rockingham County to support the workforce development needs of the manufacturer and other research and development companies in the area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmaceutical Manufacturing Grant Program and Fund; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0275)
2020-03-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 275 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1498ER)
2020-02-26HouseEnrolled
2020-02-21SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21SenateRead third time
2020-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateReported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-31HouseVOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N)
2020-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House (91-Y 7-N)
2020-01-30HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-29HouseRead first time
2020-01-27HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-16HouseReferred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-08HousePresented and ordered printed 20102789D

Same As/Similar To

SB610 (Same As) 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591284.33(n/a)See Bill Text
591284.34(n/a)See Bill Text
591284.35(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1498&201+sum+HB1498
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1498+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1498ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0275+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0201V0003+HB1498
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0006+HB1498
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0015+HB1498
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0247+HB1498
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0204+HB1498
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0358+HB1498
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0771HB1498+HB1498
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0815HB1498+HB1498

Bill Comments

feedback