VA HB1496 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth Mass Transit Fund. Allocates 3.5 percent of the Commonwealth Mass Transit Fund to commuter rail systems jointly operated by the Northern Virginia Transportation Commission (NVTC) and the Potomac and Rappahannock Transportation Commission and excludes such commuter rail systems from receiving allocations pursuant to other distributions of the Fund. The bill requires such commuter rail systems to submit reports to the Commonwealth Transportation Board. The bill limits allocations by the NVTC for distribution to the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (WMATA) to 50 percent of the total operating and capital assistance required to be provided by NVTC or other Virginia entities in the approved WMATA budget and establishes reporting requirements for WMATA. The bill codifies requirements for WMATA to adopt and submit certain planning documents first required pursuant to the eighth enactment of Chapter 854 and the eighth enactment of Chapter 856 of the Acts of Assembly of 2018 and repeals the original requirements.
Title
Commonwealth Mass Transit Fund; 3.5 percent of Fund may be allocated to NVTC.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 362 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2023 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1496ER) |
2023-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-31 | House | VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1496H1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23104630D-H1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-25 | House | Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-20 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2023-01-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 23104630D-H1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-19 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2023-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101926D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1079 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0363)
SB1079 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0363)
SB1079 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0363)
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Mass Transit
Northern Virginia
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Mass Transit
Northern Virginia
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 2 | 1526.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 3500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |