VA HB1495 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0968)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0968)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; retired law-enforcement officers employed as school security officers. Allows a retired law-enforcement officer to continue to receive his service retirement allowance during a subsequent period of employment by a local school division as a school security officer, so long as he has a break in service of at least 12 calendar months between retirement and reemployment, did not retire under an early retirement program, and did not retire under the Workforce Transition Act of 1995.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; retired law-enforcement officers employed as school security officers.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] | Del. Amanda Batten [R] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. James Leftwich [R] |
Del. Michael Webert [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0968) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 968 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1495ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference substitute printed 20109712D-H2 |
2020-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senators: Cosgrove, Marsden, Deeds |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | Delegates: Torian, Tyler, Rush |
2020-02-27 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-27 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108169D-S1 (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1495S1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108169D-S1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108169D-S1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1495H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107407D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Incorporates HB1368 (Leftwich) |
2020-01-31 | House | Incorporates HB1493 (Helmer) |
2020-01-31 | House | Incorporates HB986 (Batten) |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107407D-H1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104237D |
Same As/Similar To
HB986 (Similar To) 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Appropriations
HB1493 (Similar To) 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Appropriations
HB1368 (Similar To) 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Appropriations
SB54 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0969)
HB1493 (Similar To) 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Appropriations
HB1368 (Similar To) 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Appropriations
SB54 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0969)