VA HB1491 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Student voters; Virginia voter registration. Requires each public high school to provide to any enrolled student who is of voting age or otherwise eligible to register to vote access to Virginia voter registration information and applications, or access to the Virginia online voter registration system on a school-owned computing device, and the opportunity to complete such application during the normal course of the school day.
Title
Student voters; public high schools to provide Virginia voter registration information.
Sponsors
Del. Nancy Guy [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 612 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1491ER) |
2020-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (82-Y 16-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (82-Y 16-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Printed as engrossed 20103604D-E |
2020-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1491E |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-30 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-08 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20103604D |