VA HB1490 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fossil fuel projects moratorium; clean energy mandates. Fossil fuel projects moratorium; clean energy mandates. Establishes a moratorium, effective January 1, 2019, on approval by any state agency or political subdivision of any approval required for (i) electric generating facilities that generate fossil fuel energy through the combustion of a fossil fuel resource; (ii) import or export terminals for fossil fuel resources; (iii) certain maintenance activities relating to an import or export terminal for a fossil fuel resource; (iv) gathering lines or pipelines for the transport of any fossil fuel resource that requires the use of eminent domain on private property; (v) certain maintenance activities relating to such gathering lines or pipelines; (vi) refineries of a fossil fuel resource; and (vii) exploration for any type of fossil fuel, unless preempted by applicable federal law. The measure also requires not less than 80 percent of the electricity sold by a retail electric supplier in calendar years 2027 through 2034 to be generated from clean energy resources. In calendar year 2035 and every calendar year thereafter, all of the electricity sold by a retail electric supplier is required to be generated from clean energy resources. The clean energy mandates apply to a public utility or other person that sells not less than 1,000 megawatt hours of electric energy to retail customers or generates not less than 1,000 megawatt hours of electric energy for use by the person. The Director of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy is authorized to bring actions for injunctions to enforce these requirements. The measure also requires the Department to adopt a Climate Action Plan that addresses all aspects of climate change, including mitigation, adaptation, and resiliency. The measure provides that residents of the Commonwealth and organizations shall have the legal standing to sue to ensure that its provisions and any Climate
Title
Fossil fuel projects moratorium; establishes, clean energy mandates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104052D |