VA HB1490 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School board members who engage in war service or are called to active duty in the Armed Forces of the United States; appointment of acting school board members. Requires each school board member who is relieved from the duties of his office by reason of engaging in the war service of the United States when called forth by the Governor or being called to active duty in the Armed Forces of the United States to submit to the school board a list of names of suitable persons to perform the duties of such office as acting school board member during the period in which the regular school board member is engaged in such war service or active duty, in which case the school board is required to consider appointing and may appoint an acting school board member from such list of names. If the school board does not make an appointment from such list, the school board shall notify the submitting member in writing of the rationale for its decision. The bill provides that during such period, the acting school board member shall be vested with all the powers, authority, rights, and duties of the regular school board member for whom he is acting.
Title
School board members who are called to active duty; appointment of acting school board members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 38-N) (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 508 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1490ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 38-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 17105730D-S1 (61-Y 38-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (26-Y 14-N) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1490S1 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Newman agreed to 17105730D-S1 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 17105730D-S1 (Newman) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 36-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (63-Y 36-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 17103235D-E |
2017-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1490E |
2017-01-25 | House | Amendment by Delegate Davis agreed to |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-23 | House | Reported from Education (13-Y 8-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-12-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103235D |