VA HB1490 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0144)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0144)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; Standards of Learning tests. Directs the Board of Education to promulgate regulations to provide the same criteria for eligibility for an expedited retake of any Standards of Learning test, with the exception of the writing Standards of Learning tests, to each student regardless of grade level or course.
Title
Standards of Learning; eligibility for retake of test, exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0144) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 144 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1490ER) |
2015-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 15103990D-EH1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1490EH1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15103990D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 15103990D-H1 |
2015-01-21 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2015-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102028D |
Same As/Similar To
SB874 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0148)