VA HB1488 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Marine Resources Commission; oyster dredge; sanctuary area. Provides that the prohibition against carrying an oyster dredge except when traveling to or from (i) the licensed oyster ground or (ii) maintenance docks does not bar the carrying of a dredge through an oyster sanctuary area when the boat is traveling to or from either place.
Title
Marine Resources Commission; oyster dredge, sanctuary area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (9-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104077D |