VA HB1486 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Arts and cultural districts. Provides that arts and cultural districts may be created jointly by two or more localities. This bill is identical to SB 1225.
Title
Arts and cultural districts; districts may be created jointly by two or more localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 373 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1486ER) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-12-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102012D |