VA HB1486 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; exclusivity of remedy. Provides that if the Workers' Compensation Commission or a court on appeal from the Commission makes a finding in an unappealed order based on an evidentiary hearing or a factual stipulation of the parties that the claim relating to an accident, injury, disease, or death did not arise out of or in the course of the employee's employment, then that finding shall be res judicata between the parties and estop them from arguing before a court that the accident is barred by the exclusivity provisions of the Workers' Compensation Act. The bill further sets out the notice provisions required in order for the court finding to be res judicata.
Title
Workers' compensation; exclusivity of remedy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 606 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1486ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105498D-S1 (95-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1486S1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Substitute by Senator McEachin agreed to 15105498D-S1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Amendments by Senator McEachin withdrawn |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 15105498D-S1 (McEachin) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1486H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104730D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104730D-H1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2015-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101541D |
Same As/Similar To
SB770 (Same As) 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624)