VA HB1486 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Nursing homes; investigation of complaints; in-person interviews of residents. Requires that, whenever the Department of Health investigates a complaint against a nursing home, the Department shall conduct an in-person interview of (i) the complainant, including any long term care ombudsman who submitted or investigated the complaint, and (ii) any patient of the nursing home who is the subject of the complaint or identified in the complaint, or his legally authorized representative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing homes; investigation of complaints by VDH, in-person interviews of residents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-08 House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2011-01-18 House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote
2011-01-18 House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N)
2011-01-12 House: Assigned HWI sub: #3
2010-12-13 House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2010-12-13 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100631D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321125.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback