VA HB1484 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0411)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0411)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Medicine to amend regulations governing licensure of occupational therapists to specify Type 1 continuous learning activities. Directs the Board of Medicine to amend regulations governing licensure of occupational therapists to provide that Type 1 continuing learning activities that shall be completed by the practitioner prior to renewal of a license shall consist of an organized program of study, classroom experience, or similar educational experience that is related to a licensee's current or anticipated roles and responsibilities in occupational therapy and approved or provided by one of the following organizations or any of its components: the Virginia Occupational Therapy Association; the American Occupational Therapy Association; the National Board for Certification in Occupational Therapy; a local, state, or federal government agency; a regionally accredited college or university; or a health care organization accredited by a national accrediting organization granted authority by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to assure compliance with Medicare conditions of participation. Such regulations shall also provide that Type 1 continuing learning activities may also include an American Medical Association Category 1 Continuing Medical Education program. The bill further provides that the Board of Medicine shall not deem maintenance of any certification provided by such organization as sufficient to fulfill continuing learning requirements for occupational therapists.
Title
Occupational therapists; Board of Medicine shall amend regulations governing licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0411) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 411 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1484ER) |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1484H1 |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17103433D-H1 |
2017-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 17103433D-H1 |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-12-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102024D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Occupational Therapy
Professions and Occupations
Uncodified Legislation
Occupational Therapy
Professions and Occupations
Uncodified Legislation