VA HB1480 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Child day programs; exemptions from licensure. Removes Child day programs; exemptions from licensure. Removes certain programs from the list of child day programs exempt from licensure and clarifies that such programs are not considered child day programs and therefore are not subject to licensure. The bill also modifies the terms of certain child day programs that remain listed as exempt from licensure and requires that such programs (i) file with the Commissioner of Social Services (the Commissioner), prior to beginning operation of a child day program and annually thereafter, a statement indicating the intent to operate a child day program, identifying the Code provision relied upon for exemption from licensure, and certifying that the child day program has disclosed to the parents of children in the program the fact that it is exempt from licensure; (ii) report to the Commissioner all incidents involving serious injury or death to children attending the child day program; (iii) have a person trained and certified in first aid and cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR) present at the child day program; (iv) comply with background check requirements established by regulations of the Board of Social Services (the Board); (v) maintain daily attendance records; (vi) have an emergency preparedness plan in place; (vii) comply with all applicable laws and regulations governing transportation of children; (viii) comply with certain safe sleep practices for infants; and (ix) post in a visible location notice that the program is not licensed by the Department of Social Services and only certifies basic health and safety requirements. The bill exempts from licensure any program offered by a local school division, operated for no more than four hours per day, staffed by local school division employees, and attended by school-age children who are enrolled in public school within such school division. The bill also modifies staffing ratios for religious-exempt child day centers. The bill directs (a) the Board to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill and (b) the Commissioner to establish a process to inspect child day programs exempt from licensure and a process to gather and track aggregate data regarding child injuries and deaths that occur at such child day programs. The bill has a
Title
Child day programs; exemptions from licensure, removes certain programs from list.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106831D-H1 |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18101171D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |