VA HB1478 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0396)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0396)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes by gangs. Provides that the definition of "predicate criminal act" includes all violent felony offenses for purposes of predicate criminal acts for street gangs. The bill also increases various penalties for gang crimes.
Title
Crimes by gangs; expands definition, penalties for gang crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (63-Y 34-N) (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0396) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 396 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1478ER) |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: Adoption (63-Y 34-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 23106872D-S1 (63-Y 34-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1478S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23106872D-S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106872D-S1 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 42-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1478H1 |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105571D-H1 |
2023-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 8-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105571D-H1 |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N) |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102058D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1207 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
SB1207 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
SB1207 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 46.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 46.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 46.3:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 46.3:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |