VA HB1473 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Land use plans; zoning; notice. Alters the notice requirements related to local government adoption of land use plans and zoning ordinances by no longer requiring the notice to contain a descriptive summary of the proposed action but continues to require the locality to identify in the notice the place or places within the locality where copies of the proposed plans, ordinances, or amendments may be examined. Furthermore, such notice must include the street address or tax map parcel number of the parcels as well as the approximate acreage subject to the action. With regard to notice of proposed zoning actions, the bill also (i) removes the requirement to state general usage and density of the proposed zoning action and (ii) eliminates the requirement for an extra public hearing when land is zoned to a more intensive use classification than was contained in the previous public notice.
Title
Land use plans; zoning, notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-02-06 | House | Rereferred to Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-02-06 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2023-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-11 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103081D |