VA HB1471 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Firearms ordinances; property in multiple localities; affirmative defense. Provides that a hunter on private property that is owned by a particular landowner and spans two or more localities with differing firearms ordinances shall have an affirmative defense to a charge of violating such an ordinance in the second locality if he was in compliance at all times with the counterpart ordinance in the first locality.
Title
Firearms ordinances; property in multiple localities, affirmative defense.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101447D |