VA HB1471 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinsurance credits. Authorizes the State Corporation Commission to adopt regulations specifying additional requirements relating to or setting forth the valuation of assets or reserve credits, the amount and forms of security supporting certain reinsurance arrangements, and the circumstances pursuant to which credit will be reduced or eliminated. The measure adopts revisions to the Credit for Reinsurance Model Law adopted by the National Association of Insurance Commissioners. The revisions adjust the reinsurance collateral requirements for certified reinsurers.
Title
Reinsurance credits; SCC authorized to adopt certain regulations.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 477 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1471ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-17 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-12 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-12-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101533D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 1316.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1316.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1316.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1316.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |