VA HB147 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Housing authorities; housing research and studies. Requires the Virginia Housing Development Authority and local housing development authorities to undertake and carry out studies and analyses of housing needs and the meeting of such needs and to make the results of such studies and analyses available to the public and the building, housing, and supply industries. The bill also allows the Virginia Housing Development Authority to engage in research and disseminate information on the subject of housing.
Title
Housing authorities; housing research and studies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in General Laws |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100363D |