VA HB1469 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Felony homicide; certain drug offenses; penalty. Provides that a person is guilty of felony homicide, which constitutes second degree murder and is punishable by confinement of not less than five nor more than 40 years, if the underlying felonious act that resulted in the killing of another involved the manufacture, sale, gift, or distribution of a Schedule I or II controlled substance to another and (i) such other person's death results from his use of the controlled substance and (ii) the controlled substance is the proximate cause of his death. The bill also provides that venue for a prosecution of this crime shall lie in the locality where the underlying felony occurred, where the use of the controlled substance occurred, or where death occurred. This bill serves to overrule the Court of Appeals of Virginia decision in Woodard v. Commonwealth, 61 Va. App. 567, 739 S.E.2d 220 (2013), aff'd, 287 Va. 276, 754 S.E.2d 309 (2014).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Felony homicide; certain drug offenses constitute second degree murder, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 16-N) (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseFailed to pass
2018-03-10HouseNo further action taken
2018-03-08SenateSenators: McDougle, Stuart, Wexton
2018-03-08SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-08HouseDelegates: Hugo, Gilbert, Mullin
2018-03-08HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-08HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-07SenateSenate insisted on substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
2018-03-06HouseSenate substitute with amendment rejected by House (0-Y 96-N)
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB1469S1
2018-03-05SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-03-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-03-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107543D-S1
2018-03-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-21SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107543D-S1
2018-02-21SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 16-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (84-Y 16-N)
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1469H1
2018-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106015D-H1
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106015D-H1
2018-02-09HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 1-N)
2018-02-09HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-17HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 18105380D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18233(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1469
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1469+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1469H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1469S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0801V0161+HB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0123+HB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0755+HB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0360+HB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0374+HB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0862HB1469+HB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0885HB1469+HB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1381+HB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1016HB1469+HB1469

Bill Comments

feedback