VA HB1464 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Auxiliary lighting on motorcycles and autocycles. Provides that motorcycles and autocycles may be equipped with red or amber standard bulb running lights or light-emitting diode (LED) pods or strips as auxiliary lighting. The bill requires such lights to (i) be directed at the ground, (ii) be designed for vehicular use, (iii) not emit a beam of light greater than 25 candlepower per bulb, (iv) not be attached to wheels, and (v) not be blinking, flashing, oscillating, or rotating. Such lighting is not subject to approval by the Superintendent of State Police.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motorcycles and autocycles; auxiliary lighting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
2018-04-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 763 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1464ER)
2018-03-08HouseEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate with amendments (38-Y 2-N)
2018-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-03-05SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-03-05SenateReading of amendments waived
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateReported from Transportation with amendments (12-Y 1-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-08HouseReported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 18104843D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621012(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1464
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1464+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1464ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0763+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1901V0042+HB1464
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H19V0062+HB1464
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0696+HB1464
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S11V0136+HB1464
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0862HB1464+HB1464
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0921HB1464+HB1464
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1380+HB1464

Bill Comments

feedback