VA HB1463 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Delinquent taxes; publication by treasurer and locality. Authorizes the governing body of a locality and the treasurer to publish lists of certain local delinquent taxes whether or not they are based on information as it exists at the end of the fiscal year.
Title
Delinquent taxes; publication of list by governing body or treasurer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 41-N) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 41-N) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 409 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1463ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 41-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 41-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1463H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104728D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104728D-H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-11 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-12-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-12-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100895D |