VA HB1462 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Human Rights Act; sexual harassment; contracting agencies. Includes protection against sexual harassment in the workplace for all individuals of the Commonwealth as part of the Virginia Human Rights Act (§2.2-3900 et seq.). The bill requires that all contracting agencies entering into government contracts of over $10,000 include a provision in the contract requiring (i) the contractor to provide training to all supervisors and employees providing services in the Commonwealth on the contractor's sexual harassment policy and (ii) that the contractor agree to post the contractor's sexual harassment policy in (a) a conspicuous public place in each building located in the Commonwealth owned or leased by the contractor for business purposes or (b) the contractor's employee handbook. The bill also requires the Department of Human Resource Management to develop an online training module addressing sexual harassment in the workplace that shall be available for use by all employees and agencies of the Commonwealth, including contractors for compliance with the Fair Employment Contracting Act (§2.2-4200 et seq.), by January 1, 2019. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Human Rights Act; sexual harassment, contracting agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18105057D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |