VA HB1454 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
James River State Scenic River designation. Extends the scenic river designation of a portion of the James River located in Botetourt and Rockbridge Counties from 14 miles to 59 miles. This bill is identical to SB 1196.
Title
James River; designation portion a component of Scenic Rivers System.
Sponsors
Del. Terry Austin [R] | Sen. Chris Head [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 15-N) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 149 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1454ER) |
2017-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 15-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 17105185D-S1 (83-Y 15-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 7-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1454S1 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105185D-S1 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105185D-S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House (82-Y 16-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-18 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N) |
2016-12-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100630D |
Subjects
Botetourt County
Conservation
Counties Cities and Towns
James River
Scenic Rivers
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors
Conservation
Counties Cities and Towns
James River
Scenic Rivers
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors