VA HB1450 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utility regulation; energy efficiency standard. Requires Dominion Energy Virginia (DEV) and American Electric Power (AEP) to achieve incremental net annual savings in accordance with a schedule that starts in 2021, when savings are required to be at least 0.35 percent of the average annual energy retail sales by that utility in the three preceding calendar years, and increases the level of required savings until 2027 and thereafter, when savings are required to be at least two percent of the utility's average annual energy retail sales in the three preceding calendar years. The measure requires the utilities to retain an independent, qualified third-party evaluator to determine the utility's incremental net annual savings and other benefits of the program. The measure requires the State Corporation Commission, for any year that a utility meets the annual energy efficiency standard, to allow for the additional recovery of a margin on its program's operating expenses through a rate adjustment clause that provides the utility with a margin equal to the general rate of return on common equity. The Commission is directed to award an additional 20 basis points for each 0.1 percent of annual savings in excess of the required amount of savings, with a cap on total performance incentive awards in any year of 10 percent of the utility's total energy efficiency spending in that year. The measure also (i) increases the portion of the approved costs of certain utility energy efficiency programs that are required to be allocated to programs designed to benefit low-income, elderly, and disabled individuals from five percent to 15 percent of the approved costs of such programs and adds veterans to be benefited from such programs; (ii) requires the energy efficiency stakeholder process established for the purpose of providing input and feedback on the development of electric utilities' energy efficiency programs to include the participation of certain Commission personnel who participate in approval and oversight of utility efficiency programs; (iii) directs the Commission to increase the utility's rates to recover for revenue reductions related to energy efficiency programs if the revenue reductions have caused the utility, during the test period or periods under review, to earn more than 50 basis points below a fair combined rate of return on its generation and distribution services or, for any test period commencing after December 31, 2012, for DEV and after December 31, 2013, for AEP, more than 70 basis points below a fair combined rate of return on its generation and distribution services; (iv) allows certain large general service customers to avoid participation in energy efficiency programs and to avoid paying for the costs of such programs through a rate adjustment clause upon receiving an exemption from the Commission; and (v) provides that certain energy efficiency pilot programs may be deemed to be in the public interest.
Title
Electric utility regulation; energy efficiency standard, energy efficiency programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2020-03-12 | House | No further action taken |
2020-03-04 | House | Delegates: Sullivan, Lopez, Kilgore |
2020-03-04 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senators: Stuart, Mason, Petersen |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108613D-S1 (0-Y 97-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1450S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108613D-S1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108613D-S1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (75-Y 24-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (75-Y 24-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 20107906D-EH1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1450EH1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Amendments by Delegate Sullivan agreed to |
2020-02-10 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107906D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (17-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107906D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104643D |