VA HB1450 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0839)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

The BVU Authority. Authorizes the BVU Authority to execute, assign, or transfer property without implementing the provisions of the Virginia Public Procurement Act any internal contract between the divisions of the Authority that following such execution, assignment, or transfer will be between the Authority and the purchaser of the Authority's assets. This bill contains an emercengy clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BVU Authority; powers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 3-A) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 2-N 2-A) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0839)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 839 (effective 4/18/18)
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1450ER2)
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-30HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
2018-03-09SenateSigned by President
2018-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1450ER)
2018-03-07HouseEnrolled
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate (36-Y 1-N 3-A)
2018-03-05SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate (36-Y 2-N 2-A)
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27SenateReported from Local Government (11-Y 1-N 1-A)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 18106968D-EH1
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1450EH1
2018-02-12HouseEmergency clause deleted
2018-02-12HouseAmendment by Delegate Campbell agreed to
2018-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106968D-H1
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106968D-H1
2018-02-09HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2018-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed with emergency clause 18105332D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1527207(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1450
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1450+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1450H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1450EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1450ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1450ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0839+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0702V0038+HB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0702V0048+HB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H07V0048+HB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0694+HB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S07V0099+HB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0829HB1450+HB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0904HB1450+HB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0906HB1450+HB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0907HB1450+HB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1657+HB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1254HB1450+HB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1255HB1450+HB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1258HB1450+HB1450

Bill Comments

feedback