VA HB1448 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; recommendations; model policies; selection and removal of public school library materials. Requires the Department of Education, in consultation with local school boards, public school librarians, parents of public school students, and other interested stakeholders, to make recommendations to the General Assembly, the Board of Education, and local school boards no later than September 1, 2024, on the adoption of model policies for the selection and removal of books and other audiovisual materials available to students in public school libraries. Department of Education; recommendations; model policies; selection and removal of public school library materials. Requires the Department of Education, in consultation with local school boards, public school librarians, parents of public school students, and other interested stakeholders, to make recommendations to the General Assembly, the Board of Education, and local school boards no later than September 1, 2024, on the adoption of model policies for the selection and removal of books and other audiovisual materials available to students in public school libraries.
Title
Public school library materials; DOE to make recommendations, model policies, selection and removal.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Orrock [R] | Sen. Tara Durant [R] | Sen. Emily Brewer [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Del. Marie March [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Pass By (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Pass By (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 47-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (51-Y 47-N) |
2023-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 23101476D-E |
2023-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1448E |
2023-01-25 | House | VOTE: Pass By (52-Y 48-N) |
2023-01-25 | House | Motion to pass by floor Amendment offered by Delegate Simon agreed to (52-Y 48-N) |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-18 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2022-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101476D |