VA HB1443 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0142)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0142)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use of seclusion and restraint in public schools; Board of Education regulations. Requires the Board of Education to adopt regulations on the use of seclusion and restraint in public elementary and secondary schools in the Commonwealth. The bill requires that such regulations be consistent with certain existing guidance documents; include definitions of terms, criteria for use, restrictions on use, training requirements, notification requirements, reporting requirements, and follow-up requirements; and address distinctions between certain student populations. The bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Commission on Youth.
Title
Public schools; Board of Education regulations on use of seclusion and restraint.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0142) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 142 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1443ER) |
2015-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 15101667D-E |
2015-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1443E |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-02 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2014-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101667D |
Same As/Similar To
SB782 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0147)