VA HB1442 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; assessment of wetlands. Directs the commissioner of revenue, when separately and specially assessing wetlands at the request of the property owner and if the assessing official disagrees with the property owner as to the presence of wetlands, to recognize (i) the National Wetlands Inventory Map prepared by the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, (ii) a wetland delineation map confirmed by a Preliminary Jurisdictional Determination, or (iii) an Approved Jurisdictional Determination issued by the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers and provided by the property owner.
Title
Real property tax; assessment of wetlands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 603 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1442ER) |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18106497D-EH1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1442EH1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Amendments by Delegate Orrock agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106497D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106497D-H1 |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18103883D |