VA HB1441 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; proof of citizenship. Requires any person applying to register to vote to provide proof of his United States citizenship. The bill provides that the general registrars shall reject any voter registration application not accompanied by one of the proofs of citizenship enumerated in the bill. Under the provisions of the bill, any person who is registered in the Commonwealth on July 1, 2024, shall be deemed to have provided satisfactory proof of citizenship and shall not be required to submit proof of citizenship so long as the person remains registered in the Commonwealth.
Title
Voter registration; proof of citizenship.
Sponsors
Del. Bill Wiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-28 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104259D |